# NCERT Solutions for Class 6 Maths Chapter 2 Whole Numbers

Here, student will find Chapter 2 Whole Numbers Class 6 Maths NCERT Solutions which will develop your necessary skill to solve more and more questions. You can download PDF of Class 6 Maths Chapter 2 Whole Numbers NCERT Solutions that will provide good experience and provide opportunities to learn new things. These NCERT solutions are prerequisites before solving exemplar problems and going for supplementary Maths Books.

Chapter 2 NCERT Solutions which are accurate and detailed are prepared by Studyrankers experts which will make learning exciting. It will help you in rectifying all those mistakes that can happen in the exams and getting command over the subject. Page No: 31

Exercise 2.1

1. Write the next three natural numbers after 10999.

11000 , 11001, 11002

2. Write the three whole numbers occurring just before 10001.

10000, 9999,9998

3. Which is the smallest whole number?

0 is the smallest whole number.

4. How many whole numbers are there between 32 and 53?

(33,34,35,36,37,38,39,40,41,42,43,44,45,46,47,48,49,50,51,52)
There are 20 whole numbers lie between 32 and 53.

5. Write the successor of :
(a) 2440701
(b) 100199
(c) 1099999
(d) 2345670

a) 2440701 = 2440701 + 1 = 2440702.

b) 100199 = 100199 + 1 = 100200

c) 1099999 = 1099999 + 1 = 1100000

d) 2345670 = 2345670 + 1 = 2345671

6. Write the predecessor of :
(a) 94
(b) 10000
(c) 208090
(d) 7654321

(a) 94 = 94 – 1 = 93

(b) 10000 = 10000 – 1= 9999

(c) 208090 = 208090 – 1 = 208089

(d) 7654321 = 7654321 – 1 = 76543210

7. In each of the following pairs of numbers, state which whole number is on the left of the other number on the number line. Also write them with the appropriate sign (>,< ) between them.
(a) 530, 503
(b) 370, 307
(c) 98765, 56789
(d) 9830415, 10023001

(a) 530 > 503
530 is on the left side of number line.

(b) 370 > 307
370 is on the left side of number line.

(c) 98765 > 56789
98765 is on the left side of the number line

(d) 9830415 < 10023001
10023001 is the left side of the number line.

8. Which of the following statements are true (T) and which are false (F) ?
(a) Zero is the smallest natural number.
(b) 400 is the predecessor of 399.
(c) Zero is the smallest whole number.
(d) 600 is the successor of 599.
(e) All natural numbers are whole numbers.
(f ) All whole numbers are natural numbers.
(g) The predecessor of a two digit number is never a single digit number.
(h) 1 is the smallest whole number.
(i) The natural number 1 has no predecessor.
(j) The whole number 1 has no predecessor.
(k) The whole number 13 lies between 11 and 12.
(l) The whole number 0 has no predecessor.
(m) The successor of a two digit number is always a two digit number.

(a) 0 is not a natural number (false)

(b) Predecessor of 399 is 398 (false)

(c) True

(d) 599 + 1 = 600 (true)

(e) True

(f) 0 is whole number but not natural numbers.(false)

(g) False

(h) 0 is the smallest whole number (false)

(i) True

(j) False

(k) False

(l) True

(m) False

Page No: 40

Exercise 2.2

1. Find the sum by suitable rearrangement:
(a) 837 + 208 + 363
(b) 1962 + 453 + 1538 + 647

(a) 837 + 208 + 363 = (837 + 363) + 208 = 1200 + 208 = 1408

(b) 1962 + 453 + 1538 + 647 = (1962 + 1538) + (647 + 453)
= 3500 + 1100 = 4600

2. Find the product by suitable rearrangement:
(a) 2 × 1768 × 50
(b) 4 × 166 × 25
(c) 8 × 291 × 125
(d) 625 × 279 × 16
(e) 285 × 5 × 60
(f) 125 × 40 × 8 × 25

(a) 2 × 50 × 1768 = 176,800

(b) 166 × 25 × 4 = 16600

(c) 291 × 125 × 8 = 291000

(d) 285 × 60 × 5 = 2790000

(e) 285 × 60 × 3 = 85500

(f) 125 × 40 × 25 × 8 = 1000000

3. Find the value of the following:
(a) 297 × 17 + 297 × 3
(b) 54279 × 92 + 8 × 54279
(c) 81265 × 169 – 81265 × 69
(d) 3845 × 5 × 782 + 769 × 25 × 218

(a) 297 × (17 + 3 ) = 297 × 20 = 5940.

(b) 54279 × (92 + 8)
= 54279 × 100 = 5427900.

(c) 81265 × (169 – 69)
81265 × 100 = 8126500

(d) 3845 × 5 × 782 + 769 × 5 × 5 × 218
= 3845 × 5 × (782 + 218)
= 19225 × 1000 = 19225000.

4. Find the product using suitable properties.
(a) 738 × 103
(b) 854 × 102
(c) 258 × 1008
(d) 1005 × 168

(a) 738 × 103
= (738 × 100) + (738 × 3)
= 73800 + 2214 = 76014

(b) 854 × 102
= (854 × 100) + (854 × 2)
= 85400 + 1708 = 87108

(c) 258 × 1008
= (258 × 1000) + (258 × 8)
= 258000 + 2064 = 260064

(d) 1005 × 168 = (1000 + 5) × 168
= (1000 × 168) + (5 × 168)
= 168000 + 840 = 168840

5. A taxi driver filled his car petrol tank with 40 litres of petrol on Monday. The next day, he filled the tank with 50 litres of petrol. If the petrol costs Rs 44 per litre, how much did he spend in all on petrol?

Petrol filled on Monday = 40 litres
Petrol next day filled = 50 litres
Total quantity of petrol filled = (40 +50) litres
Cost of petrol per litres = 44
Total amount of money spent on petrol = 44 × (40 + 50)
= 44 × 90 = Rs 3960

Page No: 41

6. A vendor supplies 32 litres of milk to a hotel in the morning and 68 litres of milk in the evening. If the milk costs Rs 15 per litre, how much money is due to the vendor per day?

In the morning vendor supplies = 32 litres.
In the evening vendor supplies = 68 litres.
Cost of milk per litre = Rs 15
Total cost of per day = 15 × ( 32 + 68)
= 15 × 100 = Rs 1500

7. Match the following: (i) ➝ C
(ii) ➝ A
(iii) ➝ B

Page No: 43

Exercise  2.3

1. Which of the following will not represent zero:
(a) 1 + 0
(b) 0 × 0
(c) 0 / 2
(d) (10 - 10)/2

(a) 1 + 0 =  1 (not represent zero)
(b) 0 × 0 = 0 (it represent  zero)
(c) 0 / 2 = 0 (it represent zero)
(d) (10 – 10)/ 2 = 0 (it represent zero)

2. If the product of two whole numbers is zero, can we say that one or both of them will be zero? Justify through examples.

Product of two whole number is zero then both of them may be zero
0 × 3 =0
1 × 3 = 3

3. If the product of two whole numbers is 1, can we say that one or both of them will be 1? Justify through examples.

Product of two whole number is 1 , both number is equal to 1.
For example , 1 × 1 = 1 , 1 × 6 = 6
In both example, number is multiplied by 1.

4. Find using distributive property :
(a) 728 × 101
(b) 5437 × 1001
(c) 824 × 25
(d) 4275 × 125
(e) 504 × 35

(a) 728 × 101
= (728 × 100) + (728 × 1)
= 72800 + 728
= 73528

(b) 5437 × 1001
= (5437 × 1000) + (5437 × 1)
= 5437000 + 5437
= 5442437

(c) 824 × 25
= (800 + 24) × 25
= (800 + 25 – 1) × 25
= (800 × 25) + ( 25 × 25) – (1 × 25)
= (20000 × (625 – 25)
= 20000 + 600 = 20600

(d) 4275 × 125
= (4000 + 25 + 200 + 50) × (100 + 25)
= (4000×100) + (25×100) + (200×100) + (50×100) + (4000×25) + (25×25) + (200×25) + (50×25)
= 400000 + 2500 + 20000 + 5000 + 100000 + 625 + 5000 + 1250
= 534375

(e) 504 × 35
= (500 + 4) × 35
= (500 × 35) + (4 × 35)
= 17500 + 140 = 17640

5. Study the pattern : 1 × 8 + 1 = 9
1234 × 8 + 4 = 9876
12 × 8 + 2 = 98
12345 × 8 + 5 = 98765
123 × 8 + 3 = 987
Write the next two steps. Can you say how the pattern works? (Hint: 12345 = 11111 + 1111 + 111 + 11 + 1).

123456 × 8 + 6 = 987648 + 6 = 987654
1234567 × 8 + 7 = 9876536 + 7 = 9876543
Pattern are use in following ways
123456 = 123456 × 8 (111111+11111+1111+111+11+1) × 8
= 111111 × 8 + 11111 × 8 +1111 × 8 + 111 × 8 + 11 × 8 + 1× 8
= 888888 + 88888 +8888 +888 +88 + 8 = 987648
123456 × 8 +6 = 987648 + 6 = 987654

## NCERT Solutions for Class 6 Maths Chapter 2 Whole Numbers

NCERT Solutions for Class 6 will be useful in fetching more marks in the exams. The counting numbers are called natural numbers. The natural numbers along with zero form the collection of whole numbers.

(i) '0' is the smallest whole number.
(ii) There is no largest whole number.
(iii) Every natural number is a whole number but '0' is a whole number which is not a natural number.
(iv) There is no predecessor of '0' in whole numbers.

You can find exercisewise Class 6 NCERT Solutions from the links given below through which one can study at their ease. It will be help you in knowing variety of concepts and developing problem solving skills. These solutions are updated according to the latest NCERT Class 6 Maths textbook.

These NCERT Solutions will help you in completing homework in no time and make aware of the difficulty of questions. It will serve as beneficial tool that can be used to recall various questions any time.

### NCERT Solutions for Class 6 Maths Chapters:

 Chapter 1 Knowing Our Numbers Chapter 3 Playing with Numbers Chapter 4 Basic Geometrical Ideas Chapter 5 Understanding Elementary Shapes Chapter 6 Integers Chapter 7 Fractions Chapter 8 Decimals Chapter 9 Data Handling Chapter 10 Mensuration Chapter 11 Algebra Chapter 12 Ratio and Proportion Chapter 13 Symmetry Chapter 14 Practical Geometry

FAQ on Chapter 2 Whole Numbers

#### How many exercises in Chapter 2 Whole Numbers?

Chapter 2 consists of three exercises which are very important for the purpose of exams and cover the syllabus in less time. These NCERT Solutions are updated as per the latest guidelines by CBSE. Through the help of the concepts, you can easily tackle the questions given the supplementary books.

#### What is Closure property of Addition?

Two whole numbers add up to give another whole number. This is the closure property of the whole numbers. It means that the whole numbers are closed under addition. If a and b are two whole numbers and a + b = c, then c is also a whole number. 5 + 3 = 8 (whole number).

#### What is Closure property of Subtraction?

When one whole number is subtracted from another, the difference is not always a whole number. This means that the whole numbers are not closed under subtraction. If a and b are two whole numbers and a − b = c, then c is not always a whole number. Take a = 8 and b = 4, a − b = 8 − 4 = 4 and b − a = 4 − 8 = −4 (not a whole number).

#### What is Closure property of Multiplication?

Multiplication of two whole numbers will result in a whole number. Suppose, a and b are the two whole numbers and a × b = c, then c is also a whole number. Let a = 8, b = 5, 8 × 5 = 40 (whole number). The whole number is closed under multiplication.